Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/22/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/09/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/17/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/2004