Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/30/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/05/2004