Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/22/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/22/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/07/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/07/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/07/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/07/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/07/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/07/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/22/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/22/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/28/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/28/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/07/2004