Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/05/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/05/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/05/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/05/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/05/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/11/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/11/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/11/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/12/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/26/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/26/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/04/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/04/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/19/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/14/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/03/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/24/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/08/2003