Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/08/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/08/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/08/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/08/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/08/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/08/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/08/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/09/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/09/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/09/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/13/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/15/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/06/2004