There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 411 Midway Avenue in Mascotte, Florida, as the "Specialist Eric Ramirez Post Office".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/30/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-402. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2004 Signed by President.
10/19/2004 Presented to President.
10/10/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11125-11126)
09/28/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7709)
09/08/2004 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/30/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-402. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/2004 Signed by President.
10/19/2004 House Presented to President.
10/12/2004 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
10/10/2004 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11125-11126)
09/29/2004 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
09/28/2004-8:25pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2004-8:25pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7709)
09/28/2004-8:13pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5027.
09/28/2004-8:13pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7709-7710)
09/28/2004-8:13pm House Mr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/15/2004 House Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/15/2004 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/08/2004 House Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
09/08/2004 House Introduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform09/08/2004 Referred to
09/15/2004 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5027.


Subjects (10)

  • Commemorations
  • Congressional tributes
  • Florida
  • Military personnel
  • Names
  • National Guard
  • Postal facilities

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5027. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-402 (10/30/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 411 Midway Avenue in Mascotte, Florida, as the "Specialist Eric Ramirez Post Office."