Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/05/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/02/2004