Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/13/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/14/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/23/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/23/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/23/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/06/2004