Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/15/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/30/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/09/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/19/2004