Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/30/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/09/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/09/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/09/2004