Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/07/2004