Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/15/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/15/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/15/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/15/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/15/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/15/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/15/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/15/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/15/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/15/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/15/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/15/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/15/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/15/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/15/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/15/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/23/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/23/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/23/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/23/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/23/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/23/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/23/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/23/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/30/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/30/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/30/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/30/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/07/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/09/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/09/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/09/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/09/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/09/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/09/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/09/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/09/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/09/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/19/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/19/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/19/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/19/2004