Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/15/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/15/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/15/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/15/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/23/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 09/30/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 09/30/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/30/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/30/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/30/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/30/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/30/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/07/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 10/07/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/09/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/09/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/09/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/09/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/09/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/09/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/09/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/09/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/09/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/09/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/09/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/09/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/19/2004