Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/14/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/14/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/14/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/14/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/15/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/15/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/22/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 09/22/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/22/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/22/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/22/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/22/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/22/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/23/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/23/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/23/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/29/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/29/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/29/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/29/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/29/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/06/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/06/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/06/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/06/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/08/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/08/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/08/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/08/2004