Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/13/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/15/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/21/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/21/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/29/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/29/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/30/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/17/2004