Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/13/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/15/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/21/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/21/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/29/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/19/2004