Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/21/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/21/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/22/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/30/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/08/2004