Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/28/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/28/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/04/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/06/2004