Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 09/23/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/29/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/29/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/30/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/04/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/04/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/05/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/07/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/08/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/16/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/16/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/19/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/07/2004