Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/24/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/28/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/28/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/28/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/28/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/29/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/29/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/29/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/04/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/04/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/04/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/04/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/04/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/04/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/04/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/05/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/05/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/05/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/05/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/05/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/07/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/07/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/08/2004