There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Higher Education Extension Act of 2004

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Higher Education Extension Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

Higher Education Extension Act of 2004

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Higher Education Extension Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To temporarily extend the programs under the Higher Education Act of 1965.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/25/2004Became Public Law No: 108-366. (TXT | PDF)
10/25/2004Signed by President.
10/13/2004Presented to President.
10/09/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10921)
10/06/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 10/7/2004 H8317)
09/30/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/25/2004Became Public Law No: 108-366. (TXT | PDF)
10/25/2004Signed by President.
10/13/2004HousePresented to President.
10/09/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/09/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10921)
10/07/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/06/2004-11:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/06/2004-11:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 10/7/2004 H8317)
10/06/2004-11:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5185.
10/06/2004-11:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 10/7/2004 H8317-8319)
10/06/2004-11:17pmHouseMr. Boehner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/30/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
09/30/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/30/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/06/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/06/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/30/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5185.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5185. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-366 (10/25/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on October 6, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Higher Education Extension Act of 2004 - Provides for a temporary extension of programs under the Higher Education Act of 1965 (HEA).

Extends through FY 2005 the authorization of appropriations for, and the duration of, each program authorized under HEA. Requires the extended FY 2005 funding for any HEA program to be at a level that is the greater of: (1) the amount authorized to be appropriated for FY 2004; or (2) the amount appropriated for FY 2004.

Provides for continued performance through FY 2005 of any FY 2004 HEA functions by the Secretary of Education, a State, an institution of higher education, a guaranty agency, a lender, or another person or entity. Continues advisory committees, interagency organizations, or other entities and their required or authorized HEA functions.

Prohibits applying certain contingent and automatic extensions under the General Education Provisions Act to further extend the authorization of appropriations for any program on the basis of its extension under this Act.