Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/30/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/30/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/30/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/05/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/07/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/07/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/07/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/07/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/08/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/08/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/08/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/08/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/08/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/08/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/08/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/08/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/20/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 11/20/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/20/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/20/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/20/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/20/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/20/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/20/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/20/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/20/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/20/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 11/20/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/20/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/20/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/20/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/20/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/20/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/20/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/20/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/24/2004