Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 10/04/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/05/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/05/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/05/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/05/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/05/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/06/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/06/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/06/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/09/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/09/2004