Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/05/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 10/05/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/05/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/05/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/07/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/2004
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/08/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/08/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/17/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/19/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/19/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/19/2004