Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/04/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/04/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/05/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/25/2003