Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/07/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/16/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/16/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/16/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/18/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/18/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/18/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/19/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 11/19/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/19/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/19/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/19/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/06/2004