Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/05/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/18/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/18/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/25/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/07/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/10/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/20/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/21/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/21/2004