Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/11/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/11/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 02/11/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/12/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/13/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/25/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/25/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/25/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/27/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/05/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/11/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/11/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/20/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/07/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/08/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/11/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/29/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/01/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/13/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/14/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/03/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/09/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/17/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/17/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/17/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/17/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/19/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/19/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/25/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/09/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/15/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/15/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/21/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/21/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/21/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/21/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/22/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/22/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/23/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/24/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/09/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/09/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/24/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/20/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/09/2004