Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/25/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2003