There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

American History and Civics Education Act of 2004

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

American History and Civics Education Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

American History and Civics Education Act of 2004

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

American History and Civics Education Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize grants to establish academies for teachers and students of American history and civics, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/21/2004Became Public Law No: 108-474. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2004Signed by President.
12/10/2004Presented to President.
12/07/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11861)
11/19/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10023)
11/16/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/21/2004Became Public Law No: 108-474. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2004Signed by President.
12/10/2004HousePresented to President.
12/07/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/07/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11861)
11/19/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/19/2004-12:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/19/2004-12:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10023)
11/19/2004-11:48amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5360.
11/19/2004-11:48amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10023-10024)
11/19/2004-11:48amHouseMr. Castle moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/16/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
11/16/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce11/16/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5360.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5360. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-474 (12/21/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on November 19, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

American History and Civics Education Act of 2004 - Authorizes the Secretary of Education to award up to 12 grants, on a competitive basis, to entities with demonstrated expertise in historical methodology or the teaching of history to establish: (1) Presidential Academies for Teaching of American History and Civics that may offer workshops for both veteran and new teachers of such subjects; and (2) Congressional Academies for Students of American History and Civics. Allows such grants to be made from funds appropriated for FY 2005 or any subsequent fiscal year for the Secretary's Fund for the Improvement of Education.

Authorizes the Secretary to award grants to the National History Day Program to continue and expand its activities to promote the study of history and improve instruction.