Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/08/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/08/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/05/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/05/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/05/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/20/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/20/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 11/19/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004