Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/06/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/02/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/02/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/29/2003