Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/25/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/24/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/14/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/03/2003