Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/12/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/12/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/12/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/12/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/12/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/12/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/13/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/06/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/11/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/19/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/19/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/26/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/29/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/29/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/07/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/09/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/20/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 06/03/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/11/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/19/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/19/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/08/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/08/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/22/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/03/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/10/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/16/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/17/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/25/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/30/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/11/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/11/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/20/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/18/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/14/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/21/2004