Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/12/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/12/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/12/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/12/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/07/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/07/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/06/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/20/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/20/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/26/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/18/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/2004