Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/13/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/13/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/13/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/13/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/13/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/13/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/13/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/13/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/25/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/25/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/25/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/25/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/25/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/25/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/25/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/27/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/27/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/27/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/27/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/27/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/27/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 03/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/05/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/05/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/05/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/05/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/05/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/05/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/05/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/11/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/13/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/19/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/19/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/19/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/19/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/19/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/19/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/26/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/26/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/26/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/02/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/02/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/02/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/09/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/09/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/02/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/04/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/04/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/09/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/09/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/16/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/16/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/18/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/22/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/23/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/07/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/20/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/08/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/18/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/19/2004