Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/03/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/03/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/2003