Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/06/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/06/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/06/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/06/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/06/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/13/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/13/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/20/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/20/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/20/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/03/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/03/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/11/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/11/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/11/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/09/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/09/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/15/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/05/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/05/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/20/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/28/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/18/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/09/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/15/2004