Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/13/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2004