Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/08/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/08/2004