Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/10/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/20/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/24/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/24/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/04/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/02/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/08/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/16/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/22/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/22/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/07/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/21/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/05/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/05/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/07/2004