Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 02/12/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/12/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/26/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/26/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/26/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/26/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/26/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/06/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/06/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/07/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/07/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/14/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/19/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/05/2003