Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/07/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/11/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/11/2004