Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/07/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/07/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/07/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/13/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/13/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/13/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/06/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/21/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/21/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/21/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/26/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/08/2004