Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/04/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/25/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/25/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/07/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/07/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/10/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/20/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/20/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/20/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/20/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/09/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/04/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/09/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/15/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/05/2004