Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/29/2003