There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Care for Filipino World War II Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve benefits for Filipino veterans of World War II and surviving spouses of such veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2003 Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
03/12/2003 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/12/2003 Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/12/2003 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E197)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2003 Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2003 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/27/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/27/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/27/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/11/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/01/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/03/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/10/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/03/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/17/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/08/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/11/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits03/12/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/12/2003 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.664.

Subjects (25)

  • Asians
  • Cemeteries and funerals
  • Clinics
  • Disabled
  • East Asia
  • Guerrilla warfare
  • History
  • Hospital care
  • Long-term care
  • Nursing homes
  • Philippines
  • Survivors' benefits
  • Veterans' benefits
  • Veterans' disability compensation
  • Veterans' medical care
  • Veterans' pensions
  • Widowers
  • Widows
  • Women
  • World War II

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.664. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2003)

Health Care for Filipino World War II Veterans Act - Requires (current law authorizes) the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish hospital and nursing home care and medical services to any individual who is a Commonwealth Army veteran or new Philippine Scout (current law) and who is: (1) residing in the United States; and (2) a U.S. citizen or alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence.

Provides a rate of payment equal to the rate provided for active-service veterans and their survivors for: (1) dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of Commonwealth Army veterans or new Philippine Scouts; and (2) veterans' disability compensation for new Philippine Scouts residing in the United States.

Provides national cemetery burial benefits for new Philippine Scouts.