Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/27/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/27/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/27/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/11/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/01/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/03/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/10/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/03/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/17/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/08/2004