Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/09/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/07/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/10/2004