Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/25/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/19/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/09/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/09/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/20/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/20/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/20/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/20/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/20/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/20/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/20/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/20/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/05/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew